CT SB00852 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) allow the Connecticut Health and Educational Facilities Authority to (A) finance projects for any purpose approved by the authority, (B) issue bonds for out-of-state health care institutions, and (C) make loans and transfer funds to its subsidiaries, and (2) allow the Connecticut Higher Education Supplemental Loan Authority to (A) fund the Special Capital Reserve Fund with a surety policy, (B) increase its Special Capital Reserve Fund backed bond limit to five hundred million dollars, (C) provide education financial assistance other than loans and grants, and (D) add the state pledge for its bond holders.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Health And Educational Facilities Authority And The Connecticut Higher Education Supplemental Loan Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-04-06 | Senate | File Number 281 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 190 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |