CT SB00852 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To include personal financial management in the public school curriculum and to establish a pilot program for the teaching of personal financial management in certain school districts.
Title
An Act Concerning The Establishing Of A Personal Financial Management Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |