CT SB00852 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - House Calendar Number 625
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - House Calendar Number 625
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To give the Department of Social Services a means to identify in advance nursing homes in danger of bankruptcy, receivership or closure and to assist eligible residents to move into a community-based setting.
Title
An Act Concerning Nursing Home Oversight And Community-based Placements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 337 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 625 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7213 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | File Number 339 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 255 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |