CT SB00847 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require health screening of newborn infants no earlier than twenty-four hours after the birth of the newborn infant and not later than forty-eight hours after the birth of such infant, and to add various metabolic and genetic disorders to the newborn infant screening panel.
Title
An Act Concerning Newborn Infant Health Screening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | File Number 215 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 170 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |