CT SB00846 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To specify that the municipal gain may be used to provide broadband Internet service, to require the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to adopt regulations for the process for public utility pole attachments and to allow municipalities to establish and administer enterprise funds for the use, operation and management of municipal broadband services.
Title
An Act Concerning The Municipal Gain, The Preparation Of Utility Poles And Enterprise Funds For Municipal Broadband Services.
Sponsors
House Energy and Technology Committee | Rep. Maria Horn [D] | Rep. Jason Doucette [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] |
Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D] | Rep. Christine Palm [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-04-04 | Senate | File Number 451 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 204 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |