CT SB00844 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To protect the rights of minor parties to the ballot and to their chosen party designation, to require party rules to include the method of selecting state central committee members and state party leadership positions and to detail the method by which minor parties may amend their state party rules.
Title
An Act Concerning Voting Rights Of Members Of Minor Parties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | File Number 702 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 399 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |