CT SB00843 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 566
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To elevate the penalty for dissemination of intimate images in the case of dissemination to multiple persons by certain electronic means.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Unlawful Dissemination Of Intimate Images.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 122 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateHouse Calendar Number 566
2019-05-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-09SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-25SenateFile Number 796
2019-04-25SenateSenate Calendar Number 388
2019-04-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-25SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-11SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-09SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/22
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback