CT SB00843 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand in-service training for teachers, administrators and pupil personnel to include the recognition of trauma-informed behavior in children to enable such teachers, administrators and pupil personnel to more adequately respond to students with mental, emotional or behavioral health needs.
Title
An Act Concerning Trauma-informed Practice Training For Teachers, Administrators And Pupil Personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 343 AS AMENDED (Y: 123 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 182 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 182 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-232 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 555 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Education |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6051 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | File Number 47 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 84 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |