CT SB00840 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To protect the freedom of expression of faculty members at public institutions of higher education in their scholarship, research and teaching and regarding matters of public interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Academic Freedom At Public Institutions Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback