CT SB00835 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - House Calendar Number 598
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - House Calendar Number 598
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make minor changes to environment related statutes concerning various programs of the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection including coastal structures permitting, surface and ground water classifications, hazardous waste remediation, discharge permits, ionizing radiation regulations and vehicle emissions regulations.
Title
An Act Concerning Minor Revisions To Environment-related Statutes Affecting Various Programs Of The Department Of Energy And Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 226 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 598 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7595 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | File Number 409 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 210 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |