CT SB00820 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - File Number 590
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - File Number 590
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To afford mechanisms for the challenge of certain election administration laws, practices or procedures that may impair the electoral rights of certain protected classes of individuals.
Title
An Act Concerning A State Voting Rights Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | File Number 590 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 339 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |