CT SB00817 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Office of Higher Education to study issues relating to higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateRemoved from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17SenateMoved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-26SenateFile Number 163
2019-03-26SenateSenate Calendar Number 97
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback