CT SB00816 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Calendar Number 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow the Connecticut Health and Educational Facilities Authority to assist any Connecticut hospital, nonprofit, nonstock corporation or nonprofit, nonstock, nonsectarian facility with the construction or financing of health care institutions outside of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Allowing The Connecticut Health And Educational Facilities Authority To Make Loans For The Cost Of Related Health Care Institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 185 PASS (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateHouse Calendar Number 647
2019-05-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-21SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-03SenateFile Number 368
2019-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 189
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback