CT SB00816 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Calendar Number 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Calendar Number 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow the Connecticut Health and Educational Facilities Authority to assist any Connecticut hospital, nonprofit, nonstock corporation or nonprofit, nonstock, nonsectarian facility with the construction or financing of health care institutions outside of the state.
Title
An Act Allowing The Connecticut Health And Educational Facilities Authority To Make Loans For The Cost Of Related Health Care Institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 185 PASS (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 647 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | File Number 368 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 189 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |