CT SB00815 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - House Calendar Number 552
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow the Connecticut Health and Educational Facilities Authority and the Connecticut Higher Education Supplemental Loan Authority to obtain an insurance policy in lieu of a surety bond to ensure the faithful performance of the duties of authorized officers or employees of the authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Allowing Insurance Policies In Lieu Of Surety Bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 97 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateHouse Calendar Number 552
2019-05-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-08SenateSenate Passed
2019-03-13SenateFile Number 58
2019-03-13SenateSenate Calendar Number 53
2019-03-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-13SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-28SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback