CT SB00815 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a commission on health care policy, cost containment and price variation.
Title
An Act Establishing A Commission On Health Care Policy, Cost Containment And Price Variation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2015-04-16 | Senate | File Number 700 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 419 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |