CT SB00808 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Housing to conduct a study of methods to increase housing options for municipal employees.
Title
An Act Concerning Workforce Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | File Number 224 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 124 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |