CT SB00802 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce by fifty per cent the fees charged to certain disabled veterans for sport fishing licenses, permits, tags or stamps.
Title
An Act Providing For Discounted Fishing Licenses For Certain Veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-07 | Senate | File Number 38 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 43 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |