CT SB00796 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a sexual assault forensic examiners program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Sexual Assault Forensic Examiners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 355 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 37 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-20SenatePublic Act 19-114
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-18SenateHouse Calendar Number 462
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-17SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-17SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7057
2019-02-27SenateFile Number 9
2019-02-27SenateSenate Calendar Number 22
2019-02-27SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-02-27SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/26/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-13SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-01-31SenatePublic Hearing 02/04
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback