CT SB00796 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Respectful And Person-first Language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 371 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 304 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 304 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Public Act 17-202 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 649 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A 8612 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8612 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | File Number 482 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 272 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |