CT SB00795 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - File Number 574
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - File Number 574
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Establishing The Office Of Health Strategy And Improving The Certificate Of Need Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 12 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 12 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 12 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | File Number 574 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 333 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |