CT SB00792 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish an advisory committee that shall examine how state laws may be enhanced in order to strengthen protections against discrimination on the basis of gender identity or expression that occurs in workplaces and schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Creating An Advisory Committee To Study Discrimination On The Basis Of Gender Identity Or Expression That Occurs In Workplaces And Schools In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-14SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-15SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback