CT SB00786 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - House Calendar Number 633
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Education Mandate Relief And The Transparency Of Endowed Academies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 291 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-03SenateHouse Calendar Number 633
2017-06-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-06-02SenateOn Consent Calendar
2017-06-02SenateSenate Passed
2017-04-11SenateFile Number 525
2017-04-11SenateSenate Calendar Number 274
2017-04-11SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-04-11SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-05SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM
2017-03-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-24SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-03-02SenatePublic Hearing 03/06
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback