CT SB00781 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow the waiver of fees charged for certified copies of a vital record sought in connection with a person's application for assistance from the Soldiers, Sailors and Marines Fund.
Title
An Act Concerning Fees For Certified Copies Of Vital Records Sought In Connection With The Soldiers, Sailors And Marines Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-26 | Senate | File Number 161 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 101 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |