CT SB00775 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce administrative burdens on property conveyances by recipients of public assistance.
Title
An Act Concerning Conveyances Of Property By Recipients Of Public Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-03-30 | Senate | File Number 339 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 182 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |