CT SB00774 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that any person convicted of a felony and committed to custody is informed of their eligibility to have his or her electoral privileges restored.
Title
An Act Concerning The Dissemination Of Information Concerning Voting Rights To Persons Being Released From Department Of Correction Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |