CT SB00764 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To add acupuncture and chiropractor services to those covered under Medicaid, adjust the Medicaid payment methodology for methadone maintenance providers, achieve Medicaid payment parity for nurse-midwives and podiatrists performing the same services as physicians, and provide Medicaid reimbursement to peer support specialists.
Title
An Act Concerning Medicaid Providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-23 | Senate | File Number 109 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 118 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |