CT SB00757 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To commit additional state funds to expand access to aging in place initiatives.
Title
An Act Increasing Funding For Aging In Place Initiatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-09 | Senate | File Number 34 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 69 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |