CT SB00753 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the adjustment of population data so as to count incarcerated persons as residents of their last town of residence rather than as residents of the town in which the correctional facility is located.
Title
An Act Concerning The Counting Of Certain Incarcerated Individuals For Purposes Of Determining State Legislative And Municipal Voting Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 112 AS AMENDED HOUSE AMD A (Y: 54 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 113 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 58 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 114 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 51 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 115 AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 119 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 120 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 113 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 58 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 114 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 51 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 115 AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 119 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 120 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Public Act 21-13 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-05-12 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-12 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8440 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8443 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8448 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 456 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Ruled Not Germane, Senate Amendment Schedule B 8046 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8080 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | File Number 448 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 274 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |