CT SB00753 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-13-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To expand the state-wide fracking ban to apply to all gas and oil extraction activities and to assure that such ban is permanent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The State-wide Ban On Fracking Waste.

Sponsors

House Environment Committee CommitteeRep. Patrick Boyd [D]Rep. David Michel [D]Rep. Jason Doucette [D]
Rep. Quentin Phipps [D]Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]Sen. Alexandra Bergstein [D]Rep. John Hampton [D]
Sen. Will Haskell [D]Rep. Stephen Meskers [D]Sen. Gary Winfield [D]Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R]
Rep. Fred Camillo [R]Rep. Jill Barry [D]Rep. Juan Candelaria [D]Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R]
Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D]Sen. Stephen Cassano [D]Rep. Anne Hughes [D]Rep. Patricia Dillon [D]
Rep. Joseph Gresko [D]Rep. Travis Simms [D]Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D]Rep. Kim Rose [D]
Rep. Christine Conley [D]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]Rep. Michael Winkler [D]Rep. Anthony Nolan [D]
Sen. Mae Flexer [D]Rep. Mitch Bolinsky [R]Sen. Marilyn Moore [D]Rep. Robin Comey [D]
Rep. Roland Lemar [D]Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D]Sen. Mary Daugherty Abrams [D]Rep. Kara Rochelle [D]
Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]Rep. John Frey [R]Rep. Gail Lavielle [R]
Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]Rep. Gregory Haddad [D]Rep. Susan Johnson [D]Rep. Joseph Verrengia [D]
Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D]Sen. Julie Kushner [D]Rep. Olivia Floren [R]Sen. Saud Anwar [D]
Rep. Philip Young [D]Sen. Matthew Lesser [D]Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]Rep. Maria Horn [D]
Rep. Rick Lopes [D]Rep. Devin Carney [R]Rep. Jesse MacLachlan [R]Rep. John Hennessy [D]
Rep. Emil Altobello [D]Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D]Rep. Kate Rotella [D]Rep. Arthur O'Neill [R]
Rep. Tammy Exum [D]Rep. Larry Butler [D]Rep. Gary Turco [D]Rep. William Petit [R]
Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]Rep. Henry Genga [D]Rep. Kathy Kennedy [R]Rep. Antonio Felipe [D]
Sen. John Kissel [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 343 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 262 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateHouse Calendar Number 693
2019-06-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-30SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9936
2019-05-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-01SenateNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-05-01SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-24SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-13SenateFile Number 56
2019-03-13SenateSenate Calendar Number 51
2019-03-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-13SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-26SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-25SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-01-30SenatePublic Hearing 02/04
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback