CT SB00746 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - File Number 270
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - File Number 270
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement pension reform under the Municipal Employee Retirement System for newly hired employees.
Title
An Act Amending The Municipal Employment Retirement System For Newly Hired Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | File Number 270 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 161 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Favorable |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Motion Failed HF |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |