CT SB00745 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 316
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Board of Regents for Higher Education to conduct a feasibility study on the establishment of computer programming programs related to the controlled environment agricultural industry and the construction of highly technical greenhouses at the regional community-technical colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring A Feasibility Study On The Establishment Of An Environmental Agricultural Program At Public Institutions Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 316
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 157
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-03-06SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-07SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback