CT SB00742 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Public Hearing 03/15
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Public Hearing 03/15
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To fully fund the municipal revenue sharing account for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, to provide support for municipalities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Municipal Revenue Sharing Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |