CT SB00697 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow the boards of selectmen, instead of the town meetings, of certain municipalities to enter into certain agreements to fix assessments.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Municipal Agreements To Fix Assessments.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Jaime Foster [D] | Rep. Brian Smith [D] |
Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | File Number 61 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 73 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |