CT SB00697 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 446
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit the silencing of victims in the workplace and to prevent sexual harassment by repeat offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Nondisclosure Agreements In The Workplace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateFile Number 446
2019-04-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 221
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-03-12SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-03-05SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback