CT SB00696 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-28 - House Calendar Number 558
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-28 - House Calendar Number 558
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor and technical revisions to statutes concerning planning and development.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Minor And Technical Revisions To Statutes Concerning Planning And Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 262 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 263 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 263 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Calendar Number 558 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6673 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | File Number 75 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 76 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |