CT SB00691 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 832
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 832
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the automatic erasure of criminal records in the case of misdemeanor offenses after three years following the completion of the sentence for the person's most recent misdemeanor offense, and in the case of certain felony offenses after five years following the completion of the sentence for the person's most recent felony offense.
Title
An Act Concerning Erasure Of Certain Misdemeanor Criminal Records And Expedited Pardons Review For Certain Felony Offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | File Number 832 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 434 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/29 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |