CT SB00691 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 832
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for the automatic erasure of criminal records in the case of misdemeanor offenses after three years following the completion of the sentence for the person's most recent misdemeanor offense, and in the case of certain felony offenses after five years following the completion of the sentence for the person's most recent felony offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Erasure Of Certain Misdemeanor Criminal Records And Expedited Pardons Review For Certain Felony Offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateFile Number 832
2019-04-29SenateSenate Calendar Number 434
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-29SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-11SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-25SenatePublic Hearing 03/29
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-21SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-01SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback