CT SB00685 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 366
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a committee to coordinate and modernize preapprenticeship and apprenticeship programs in various industries in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The Connecticut Apprenticeship And Education Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateFile Number 366
2019-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 190
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-03-12SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback