CT SB00678 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - File Number 158
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - File Number 158
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require certain proposed excavation markings to be made with materials that begin to fade three months after such markings are made.
Title
An Act Concerning Markings Made Pursuant To Call Before You Dig Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | File Number 158 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 93 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |