CT SB00665 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Vote to Draft
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To establish competitive sports wagering on certain sporting events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Sports Wagering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/26
2019-02-07SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback