CT SB00657 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide greater consumer protection for customers of cable television and video service.
Title
An Act Concerning Consumer Protection Of Cable Television And Video Service Customers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-09 | Senate | File Number 414 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 291 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |