CT SB00650 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To enhance protections for restraining order applicants.
Title
An Act Concerning Temporary Restraining Orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 396 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 9303 (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule C 9128 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 9303 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7208 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | File Number 754 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 444 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/28/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |