CT SB00647 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To streamline the Liquor Control Act.
Title
An Act Streamlining The Liquor Control Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 263 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 257 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 10232 (Y: 7 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 258 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 10243 (Y: 9 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 259 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 257 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 10232 (Y: 7 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 258 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 10243 (Y: 9 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 259 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Public Act 19-24 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-01 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-01 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-06-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 692 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 10243 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 10232 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-28 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9541 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | File Number 592 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 287 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |