CT SB00643 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - House Calendar Number 658
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - House Calendar Number 658
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To supplement the submission of the moderator's return to the Secretary of the State after an election with a tabulator tape or a digital image thereof.
Title
An Act Concerning The Reporting Of Election Results.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Sen. Leonard Fasano [R] | Sen. Kevin Witkos [R] | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 217 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 658 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 719 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 330 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |