CT SB00642 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 718
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To define "online platform", require such platform to make publicly available copies of electioneering communications and contact information at such platform for such communications and impose a rebuttable presumption that certain content created by or for such platform is not an independent expenditure if displayed during the ninety days prior to a primary or election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Social Media Platforms And Campaign Finance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateFile Number 718
2019-04-17SenateSenate Calendar Number 331
2019-04-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-03-19SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-06SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback