CT SB00628 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide elderly persons and persons with disabilities an opportunity to travel in a stretcher van instead of an ambulance.
Title
An Act Concerning The Nonemergency Transportation Of Elderly Persons And Persons With Disabilities Confined To A Stretcher.
Sponsors
House Transportation Committee | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Rep. Travis Simms [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |