CT SB00608 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - No New File by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To improve rental conditions for residents of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Improvement Of Rental Unit Safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-23SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 221
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 123
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Housing
2019-03-05SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-05SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Housing

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback