CT SB00607 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - House Calendar Number 553
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Labor Department and the Board of Regents for Higher Education to jointly establish nontraditional pathways to earning a bachelor's degree through apprenticeships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Apprenticeship Pathways To Earning A Bachelor's Degree.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 101 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateHouse Calendar Number 553
2019-05-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-08SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-08SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7542
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 315
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 156
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-03-12SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback