CT SB00590 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow the commercial use of sous vide when the food processed using sous vide is consumed on premises.
Title
An Act Permitting The Commercial Use Of Sous Vide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 303 AS AMENDED (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 246 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 246 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Public Act 15-140 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 611 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6739 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | File Number 694 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 415 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |